Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Dominico Tomati

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1636BornCaravonica
30 Mar 170063.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
13 Apr 170063.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
23 Mar 171174.7DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Dominico Tomati:
Bishop Giovanni Dominico Tomati (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 May 2015