Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Vincenzo de Filippi, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1656³BornVenezia
23 Sep 167922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Dec 169842.1AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
21 Dec 169842.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
11 May 171861.5AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
16 Feb 173881.2DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo de Filippi:
Bishop Giovanni Vincenzo de Filippi O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Caorle

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141, and Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015