Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Joseph Azéma

Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Titular Bishop of Murcona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1943 BornVailhauquès nell’Hérault
29 Jun 196925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
22 May 200359.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
22 May 200359.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Murcona
31 Aug 200360.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murcona

MicroData Summary for Claude-Joseph Azéma
Bishop Claude-Joseph Azéma (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jun 2016