Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Léon Wattebled

Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1946 Born
26 May 197427.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 200154.6AppointedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
1 Apr 200154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
10 Aug 202175.1RetiredBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for Robert Léon Wattebled
Bishop Robert Léon Wattebled (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalais
Ordained BishopNîmes, Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,954
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast