Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Augusto de Assis

Deceased

Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1863Born
24 Apr 189228.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 190743.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
29 Jul 190743.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
17 Nov 190743.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
29 Apr 190945.3AppointedBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
7 Feb 191652.1AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 May 191652.4InstalledBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Aug 191854.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Aug 191854.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
24 Feb 192258.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
31 Jul 193167.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Feb 196197.1DiedBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Augusto de Assis
Archbishop Antônio Augusto de Assis (born , died ) Bishop of Jaboticabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagôa Dourada

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast