Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lúcio Antunes de Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Botucatu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1863BornSão Sebastião do Rio Verde
31 May 189027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
20 Oct 190845.5AppointedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
15 Nov 190845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
19 Oct 192360.5DiedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lúcio Antunes de Souza:
Bishop Lúcio Antunes de Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Botucatu

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013