Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula e Silva, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1866BornDouradinho
24 Jan 189225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Apr 190740.5AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Jul 190740.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
4 Jun 191851.6DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula e Silva:
Bishop Francisco de Paula e Silva C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013