Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lourenço da Costa Aguiar

Deceased

Bishop of Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1847Born
20 Nov 187023.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Nov 187023.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189446.4AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
18 Mar 189446.6Ordained BishopBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
5 Jun 190557.8DiedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Lourenço da Costa Aguiar
Bishop José Lourenço da Costa Aguiar (born , died ) Bishop of Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSobral
Ordained BishopSacre-Coeur, Petropolis

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017