Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Louis de Leyssin

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1721BornAoste
19 Apr 176745.9SelectedArchbishop of Embrun, France
15 Jun 176746.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
5 Jul 176746.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
26 Aug 180180.3DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis de Leyssin:
Archbishop Pierre-Louis de Leyssin (born , died ) Archbishop of Embrun

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015