Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Félix-Pierre Fruchaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1811BornTrémentines
28 Oct 183524.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 185948.1SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
26 Sep 185948.2ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
30 Nov 185948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
10 Oct 187160.2SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
27 Oct 187160.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
6 Dec 187160.4InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
9 Nov 187463.3DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Félix-Pierre Fruchaud:
Archbishop Félix-Pierre Fruchaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 337, and Page 573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013