Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Michel-Jean-Baptiste-Paul-Augustin Micolon de Guérines

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1760BornAmbert
18 Dec 178424.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 182261.5SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
27 Sep 182262.1ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
17 Nov 182262.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
12 May 183877.7DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Michel-Jean-Baptiste-Paul-Augustin Micolon de Guérines:
Bishop Joseph-Michel-Jean-Baptiste-Paul-Augustin Micolon de Guérines (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013