Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Allué y Sesse

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1766BornAsín de Borto
14 Apr 181750.6AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
29 Jun 181750.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
25 Jul 181851.9ResignedBishop of Gerona, Spain
19 Sep 182054.0SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
8 Jan 182154.3ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
1842¹75.3DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Allué y Sesse (VIAF: 87794669)
Patriarch Antonio Allué y Sesse (born , died 1842) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 203, and Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 135, Number 728

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Jul 2016