Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Martínez Carnero

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1763BornVillar de Santos
21 May 182764.3AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
25 Nov 182764.8Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Jan 183369.9DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Martínez Carnero:
Bishop Bernardo Martínez Carnero (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 145, Number 788

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015