Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Sánchez Barragán y Vera

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1773Born
9 Jan 183056.9SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
15 Mar 183057.1ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
13 Jun 183057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
14 Aug 184673.5DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Sánchez Barragán y Vera
Bishop Juan Sánchez Barragán y Vera (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlanga

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,746
  • c2+: CB, 20 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 343
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 798
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast