Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Bergosa y Jordán

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1748BornJaca, Huesca, Spain
1773¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 180153.0AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
4 Apr 180254.1Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
2 May 180254.1InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
12 Sep 181769.5SelectedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
15 Nov 181769.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
18 Jul 181971.4DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bergosa y Jordán:
Archbishop Antonio Bergosa y Jordán (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,513
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 77, and Page 359
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 121, Number 640

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015