Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Téllez, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rafael Manuel José Benito de Vélez)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1777BornVélez de Benaudalla
1800¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Apr 181739.5AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
13 Jul 181739.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
30 May 182446.6SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
12 Jul 182446.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
29 Oct 182447.0SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Dec 182447.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
3 Aug 185072.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Téllez:
Archbishop Rafael Téllez O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 121, and Page 158
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 136, Number 729

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013