Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Bonifacio López Pulido, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1774BornMontehermoso
28 Oct 182450.5SelectedBishop of Urgell, Spain
20 Dec 182450.6ConfirmedBishop of Urgell, Spain
6 Mar 182550.8Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
21 May 182753.0AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
3 Dec 182753.6DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Bonifacio López Pulido:
Bishop Isidoro Bonifacio López Pulido O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 340, and Page 384
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 142, Number 770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013