Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Fraile García

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1763BornLantadilla
10 Feb 181955.8SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
29 Mar 181956.0ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
23 May 181956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
1 Jan 183773.7DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Fraile García:
Bishop Manuel Fraile García (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 138, Number 742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013