Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Martínez Ferro, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1774Born
1799²24.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
28 Jan 182550.9SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
27 Jun 182551.3ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
18 Sep 182551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
3 Jun 182753.2DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Martínez Ferro
Bishop Manuel Martínez Ferro O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldas de Reis

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,656
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 143, Number 775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast