Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel María Gómez de las Rivas

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1770BornSanta María de Garoña
24 Dec 183161.2SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
24 Feb 183261.4ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
15 Jul 183261.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
12 Sep 184776.9SelectedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
17 Dec 184777.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
17 Jun 185887.7DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel María Gómez de las Rivas:
Archbishop Manuel María Gómez de las Rivas (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 166
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 811

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013