Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Rodriguez de Miranda, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1764BornRaval
1789²24.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
22 Apr 182964.9SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Sep 182965.4ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Mar 183065.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Aug 183167.3DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rodriguez de Miranda
Bishop Pedro Rodriguez de Miranda O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 796
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016