Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Alonso, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1773Born
24 Feb 183359.9SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
15 Apr 183360.1ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
25 Jul 183360.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
18 Feb 184470.9DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Julián Alonso
Bishop Julián Alonso O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMota del Marqués

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,529
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 813
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast