Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Martínez de San Martín

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1773¹BornPamplona
1799¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 183260.0SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
15 Apr 183360.3ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
25 Jul 183360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Mar 184976.2DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Martínez de San Martín:
Bishop Pedro Martínez de San Martín (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,528
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 814

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013