Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pérez Minayo

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1757Born
16 Mar 181861.1AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
5 Jul 181861.4Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
29 Aug 183376.6DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pérez Minayo
Bishop Antonio Pérez Minayo (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrueña

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 136, Number 735
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast