Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Francés Caballero

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1774BornMadrid
26 May 181742.6SelectedBishop of Urgell, Spain
28 Jul 181742.8ConfirmedBishop of Urgell, Spain
21 Sep 181742.9Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Aug 182449.9SelectedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Sep 182450.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
13 Dec 184369.2DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Francés Caballero:
Archbishop Bernardo Francés Caballero (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 384
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 136, Number 731

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013