Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Charles Reiss

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1922Born
31 May 194725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
21 Oct 196745.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
21 Oct 196745.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
12 Dec 196745.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
11 Mar 198057.8AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
30 Jun 199775.1ResignedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
4 Mar 201289.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Charles Reiss (VIAF: 63637041)
Bishop John Charles Reiss (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRed Bank
Ordained PriestTrenton, Diocese of Trenton, New Jersey

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast