Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Urban Kmiec

Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1936 Born
20 Dec 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
26 Aug 198246.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
26 Aug 198246.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
3 Nov 198246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
13 Oct 199256.3AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
3 Dec 199256.4InstalledBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
12 Aug 200468.1AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
28 Oct 200468.3InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
29 May 201275.9RetiredBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Urban Kmiec
Bishop Edward Urban Kmiec (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrenton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buffalo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast