Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James John Hogan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1911Born
8 Dec 193726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
27 Nov 195948.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
27 Nov 195948.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
25 Feb 196048.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
23 May 196654.5AppointedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
6 Jul 196654.7InstalledBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
17 Oct 198675.0RetiredBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jun 200593.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for James John Hogan
Bishop James John Hogan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Altoona-Johnstown

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 9
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast