Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Horacio Suárez

Bishop Emeritus of Gregorio de Laferrere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1938 BornVilla Nueva
2 Dec 196729.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Justo, Argentina
25 Nov 200062.7AppointedBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina
23 Dec 200062.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina
29 Dec 200062.8InstalledBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina
19 Dec 201375.8RetiredBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Horacio Suárez:
Bishop Juan Horacio Suárez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gregorio de Laferrere

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gregorio de Laferrere.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,873
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Feb 2014