Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Bushu

Bishop Emeritus of Buéa, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1944 Born
7 Jan 197328.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 199248.3AppointedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
25 Mar 199348.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
30 Nov 200662.3AppointedBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
30 Jan 200762.4InstalledBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
28 Dec 201975.4RetiredBishop of Buéa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Bushu
Bishop Emmanuel Bushu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Buéa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNgorim
Ordained BishopCathedral, Yagoua, Diocese of Yagoua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buéa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,063
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast