Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphaël Marie Ze

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sangmélima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1932BornAlangana
29 Apr 196229.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 199259.2AppointedBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
25 Apr 199259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
4 Dec 200876.1RetiredBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
6 Sep 201178.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sangmélima, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Raphaël Marie Ze:
Bishop Raphaël Marie Ze (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sangmélima

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2008
  • d: CB, 8 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,667
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013