Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Lezana Vaca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1922BornPadcaya
11 Aug 194624.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 198663.8AppointedBishop of Bolivia, Military
17 May 198663.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
29 Jun 198663.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti
7 Mar 199875.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Basti
14 Apr 200077.7RetiredBishop of Bolivia, Military
28 Jul 200684.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military

MicroData Summary for Mario Lezana Vaca:
Bishop Mario Lezana Vaca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bolivia, Military

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013