Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli

Dioecesis Conversanensis-Monopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Favale, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Conversano
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Conversano (erected)
18 January 1947Territory AddedDiocese of Monopoli (Garullo, Cavallerizza, and Zingarello) Diocese of Conversano
20 October 1980Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Conversano (from Bari (-Canosa))
Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Conversano
Diocese of Monopoli
Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Conversano
188662,904.0%29007OTC
195090,00090,000100.0%91211128034017518ap1951
1969105,000105,79799.2%76441208755920227ap1971
1980112,500115,66297.3%65441091,0325417629ap1981
Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli
1990232,576237,57697.9%106301361,7108922056ap1991
1999242,000243,36099.4%102491511,60296322556ap2000
2000245,900247,09399.5%102501521,61796122456ap2001
2001245,000247,22499.1%104481521,611135818556ap2002
2002245,000247,55199.0%106391451,689135117957ap2003
2003245,500248,03299.0%103391421,728125115356ap2004
2004246,761249,26199.0%98371351,827124916356ap2005
2006243,423246,62398.7%98451431,702115915756ap2007
2013250,000252,60899.0%98461441,736135913256ap2014
2016249,650252,70798.8%94491431,745175813056ap2017
2019248,444252,74498.3%93461391,787155413256ap2020
2021246,620249,77098.7%90471371,800125411956ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Conversano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 218
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 135
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 876, to Page 877
    • Crontassi Iconografia ed Araldica dell'Episcopato Pugliese, Page 163, to Page 170
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 39, Page 500
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 1,232, and Page 1,233
  • Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 688, to Page 690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024