Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano

Archidioecesis Campobassensis-Boianensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Biagio Colaianni, Archbishop
  • Giancarlo Maria Bregantini, C.S.S., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Armando Dini, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 27 February 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,120 (432 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Abruzzo-Molise
  • Official Web Site: http://arcidiocesicampobasso.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Via Mazzini 76, 86100 Campobasso, Italia
  • Telephone: 0874.60.694
  • Fax: 0874.60.149

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Boiano
11th CenturyErectedDiocese of Boiano (erected)
Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso
29 June 1927Name ChangedDiocese of Boiano Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso
Archdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso
11 February 1973ElevatedDiocese of Boiano-Campobasso Archdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso
21 August 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano
27 February 1982Name ChangedArchdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano
21 January 1983Territory AddedArchdiocese of Benevento (Sant'Angelo Limosano, Limosano, Matrice, Campolieto, Monacilioni, San Giovanni in Galdo, Toro, Campodipietra, Jelsi, Gildone, Gercemaggiore, Riccia, Gambatesa, Tufara, Pietracatella, Macchia Valfortore, and S. Elia a Pianisi) Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano
21 January 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano (Sassinore)
Diocese of Lucera (San Bartolomeo in Galdo)
Archdiocese of Benevento

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Boiano
188687,160.0%227040OTC
Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso
1950100,000100,000100.0%6825931,075256546ap1951
195985,00090,00094.4%5820781,0891927051ap1960
197095,05095,50099.5%65431088805315649ap1971
Archdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso
198086,55691,32794.8%5535909615511651ap1981
Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano
1990127,500130,50097.7%69401091,1694813070ap1991
1999124,000126,00098.4%65401051,1804809570ap2000
2000124,000126,20098.3%66401061,1694839870ap2001
2001123,000125,90097.7%60411011,2175819170ap2002
2002124,000126,00098.4%5940991,25267310370ap2003
2003124,000126,00098.4%62401021,21567510570ap2004
2004124,000126,00098.4%5740971,27867710368ap2005
2006123,000125,00098.4%5936951,29475710070ap2007
2013124,600126,80098.3%5839971,2847679569ap2014
2016121,045126,90095.4%58431011,19819757069ap2017
2019120,320125,81095.6%6828961,25320496769ap2020
2021118,900124,30095.7%78291071,11120426469ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Boiano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 140
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 108
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 136
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125, and Page 126
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 860
  • Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 19, Page 332, to Page 334
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 20, Page 193
  • Archdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 130, and Page 131
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 594, and Page 595
  • Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 74, Page 637
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 75, Page 662, and Page 663

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 8 Apr 2024