Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Sanseverino, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1477Born
21 Nov 152750.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 152851.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
29 Apr 152851.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Aug 152851.6AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
17 Nov 152851.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 152952.5AppointedAdministrator of Conversano, Italy
16 May 153053.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
21 Dec 153154.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
11 Feb 153457.1ResignedAdministrator of Conversano, Italy
5 Sep 153457.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 Nov 153760.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
4 Aug 153962.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Jan 154366.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
17 Aug 154366.6DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sanseverino
Antonio Cardinal Sanseverino O.S.Io.Hieros. (born 1477, died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 14.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308, and Page 177
  • od/op/c01: CB, 12 Dec 2017
  • od/op/c01: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,531, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast