Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vu Duy Thông

Deceased

Bishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1952Born
26 Oct 198533.3Ordained PriestPriest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
4 Jul 200149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
4 Jul 200149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
17 Aug 200149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
25 Jul 200957.0AppointedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
3 Sep 200957.1InstalledBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
1 Mar 201764.6DiedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vu Duy Thông
Bishop Joseph Vu Duy Thông (born , died ) Bishop of Phan Thiết

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThái Binh

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,025
  • d: CB, 28 Feb 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast