Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Đnh Đc Đao

Coadjutor Bishop of Xun Lc

Titular Bishop of Gadiaufala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1945 BornThuc Hoa
27 Mar 197126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saigon, Viet Nam
28 Feb 201367.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xun Lc, Viet Nam
28 Feb 201367.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
5 Apr 201368.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
4 Jun 201570.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Xun Lc, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Đnh Đc Đao:
Bishop Joseph Đnh Đc Đao (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Xun Lc

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xun Lc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Mar 2013
  • c2+: CB, 5 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,760
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 Jun 2015