Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pham Van Thiên

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Phú Cường, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1907Born
17 Mar 193426.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 196558.4AppointedBishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
6 Jan 196658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
10 May 199386.0RetiredBishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
15 Feb 199789.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Phú Cường, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pham Van Thiên
Bishop Joseph Pham Van Thiên (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Phú Cường

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThanh My

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast