Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Xavier Cardinal Nguyên Van Thuán

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1928Born
11 Jun 195325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Huê, Viet Nam
13 Apr 196738.9AppointedBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
24 Jun 196739.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
24 Apr 197547.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
24 Apr 197547.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vadesi
24 Nov 199466.6ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
24 Nov 199466.6AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
24 Jun 199870.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
21 Feb 200172.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
21 Feb 200172.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 200274.4DiedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Nguyên Van Thuán (VIAF: 76368419)
François-Xavier Cardinal Nguyên Van Thuán (born , died ) President of Justice and Peace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuê, Vicariate Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
Ordained PriestHuê, Vicariate Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
Ordained BishopHuê, Archdiocese of Huế, Viet Nam
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Chapel of the Canons of St. Peter's, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria della Scala, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 2001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast