Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Miche, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Dausara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1805BornBruyères-en-Vosges, France
5 Jun 183024.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Mar 184438.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
10 Jun 184640.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dausara
13 Jun 184741.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dausara
27 Aug 185045.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
9 Sep 186459.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
186963.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
1 Dec 187368.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Miche:
Bishop Jean-Claude Miche M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013