Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Pinheiro

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1564AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
15 Oct 1564³Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
27 Nov 1579AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
Oct 1582DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Pinheiro
Bishop António Pinheiro (died Oct 1582) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Mós
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246, and Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast