Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pereira, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567²BornVila de Lampazos
1 Oct 161851.7AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
7 Jan 162154.0DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pereira:
Bishop Francisco Pereira O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • bp/bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015