Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Souza e Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1658³BornEvora
18 Sep 168224.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 171658.3AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
23 Aug 171658.5Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
15 Aug 173779.5DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Souza e Carvalho:
Bishop João de Souza e Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015