Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo da Gama

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornVidigneira
18 May 161540.3AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
15 Nov 161540.8Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
28 Mar 161742.2DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo da Gama:
Bishop Joćo da Gama (died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a bishop for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,050
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015