Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Teixeira Cabral

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1598AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
1 Nov 1598Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
14 May 1612AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
Jun 1614³DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Teixeira Cabral
Bishop Jerónimo Teixeira Cabral (died Jun 1614) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamego, Diocese of Lamego
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 15.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast