Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie de Laval de Bois-Dauphin

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1620BornLe Mans
30 Mar 165131.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
19 Jun 165131.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
27 Aug 165131.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
1 Jul 166141.3SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
21 Nov 166141.7ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
22 Nov 169373.7DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie de Laval de Bois-Dauphin:
Bishop Henri-Marie de Laval de Bois-Dauphin (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 220, and Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015