Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile-Paul-Angel-Constant Le Camus

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1839BornParaza
20 Dec 186223.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190161.6SelectedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
18 Apr 190161.7ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
2 Jul 190161.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
29 Sep 190667.1DiedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Emile-Paul-Angel-Constant Le Camus:
Bishop Emile-Paul-Angel-Constant Le Camus (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 488
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013