Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne de Champflour

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1646BornClermont d'Auvergne
31 Dec 170256.6SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
14 May 170357.0ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
10 Jun 170357.1Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
26 Nov 172478.5DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne de Champflour:
Bishop Étienne de Champflour (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013