Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de Mandolx

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1744BornMarseille
17 Oct 180257.9SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
20 Dec 180258.1ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
2 Feb 180358.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
17 Dec 180460.1SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
1 Feb 180560.2ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
14 Aug 181772.8DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Mandolx:
Bishop Jean-François de Mandolx (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 70, and Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015