Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel-Louis-Marie-Antoine Gaumain, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moundou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1915BornSaint-Pierre-de-l'Isle, France
12 Mar 193823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 195945.0AppointedBishop of Moundou, Chad
28 Apr 196045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Moundou, Chad
19 Dec 197460.0ResignedBishop of Moundou, Chad
20 Aug 201095.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Moundou, Chad

MicroData Summary for Samuel-Louis-Marie-Antoine Gaumain:
Bishop Samuel-Louis-Marie-Antoine Gaumain O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moundou

  • a priest for 72.4 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,690
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 34
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013